House
|
05/13/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3112
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|