E
|
06/03/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/03/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4110
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1856
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1544
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1311
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#552
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
House
|
05/02/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Pickett
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2322
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#490
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1472
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|