1 | | - | By: Pickett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 2612 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Transportation; May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | | - | vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 2612 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to a report to the legislature regarding the elimination |
---|
12 | 6 | | of toll roads. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Not later than September 1, 2016, the Texas |
---|
15 | 9 | | Department of Transportation shall submit to each standing |
---|
16 | 10 | | committee of the senate and house of representatives that has |
---|
17 | 11 | | primary jurisdiction over transportation matters a report that: |
---|
18 | 12 | | (1) lists the amount of debt service on bonds issued |
---|
19 | 13 | | for each toll project in this state; |
---|
20 | 14 | | (2) identifies, based on criteria provided by the |
---|
21 | 15 | | Texas Transportation Commission, bonds that would be appropriate |
---|
22 | 16 | | for accelerated or complete lump-sum payment of debt service; and |
---|
23 | 17 | | (3) proposes a plan to eliminate all toll roads in this |
---|
24 | 18 | | state, except for tolls on roads constructed, operated, or |
---|
25 | 19 | | maintained only with proceeds from the issuance of bonds by a toll |
---|
26 | 20 | | project entity other than the department, by methods including: |
---|
27 | 21 | | (A) the accelerated or complete lump-sum payment |
---|
28 | 22 | | of debt service on bonds identified under Subdivision (1); or |
---|
29 | 23 | | (B) requiring, as a condition on receipt of state |
---|
30 | 24 | | financial assistance, a commitment by a toll project entity to |
---|
31 | 25 | | eliminate toll collection on a project for which the financial |
---|
32 | 26 | | assistance is provided. |
---|
33 | 27 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
34 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 28 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 29 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 30 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2612 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
| 31 | + | 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 32 | + | voting. |
---|
| 33 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 34 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 35 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 2612 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 36 | + | 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. |
---|
| 37 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 38 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 39 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 40 | + | Date |
---|
| 41 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 42 | + | Governor |
---|