Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2627 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R18445 NC-D
 By: Coleman H.B. No. 2627
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2627:
 By:  Turner of Harris C.S.H.B. No. 2627


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creation of a task force to study the effects of
 population growth on counties in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  TASK FORCE TO STUDY POPULATION GROWTH IN TEXAS.
 (a)  In this Act, "task force" means the Task Force to Study
 Population Growth in Texas established under this section.
 (b)  The Task Force to Study Population Growth in Texas is
 established for the purpose of assessing the effects of population
 growth on counties in this state relating to:
 (1)  housing;
 (2)  businesses;
 (3)  available land resources;
 (4)  the state's economy;
 (5)  health care services; and
 (6)  county jails.
 (c)  The task force is composed of the following nine
 members:
 (1)  three state or local officials appointed by the
 governor;
 (2)  three state or local officials appointed by the
 lieutenant governor; and
 (3)  three state or local officials appointed by the
 speaker of the house of representatives.
 (d)  The members of the task force shall elect a presiding
 officer from among the membership.
 (e)  The offices of the governor, lieutenant governor, and
 speaker of the house of representatives shall provide staff support
 to the task force.
 (f)  The task force shall hold public hearings to achieve the
 purpose described by Subsection (b) of this section.
 (g)  A member of the task force is not entitled to receive
 compensation for service on the task force but is entitled to
 reimbursement of the travel expenses incurred by the member while
 conducting the business of the task force.
 (h)  The task force may accept gifts and grants from any
 source to be used to carry out a function of the task force.
 SECTION 2.  FINAL REPORT. Not later than November 1, 2016,
 the task force shall submit a final report to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the appropriate standing committees of the legislature.  The
 report shall include a summary and analysis of:
 (1)  hearings and studies conducted by the task force;
 (2)  legislation proposed by the task force; and
 (3)  other findings and recommendations made by the
 task force.
 SECTION 3.  APPOINTMENTS. Not later than December 1, 2015,
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house
 of representatives shall make the appointments to the task force as
 described by Section 1(c) of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this
 Act expires August 31, 2017.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.