Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2629 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kacal, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2629
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to unauthorized persons at public or private institutions
 of higher education in this state and to trespass, damage, or
 defacement occurring on the grounds of those institutions; amending
 provisions subject to a criminal penalty and creating offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 51.202, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.202.  RULES AND REGULATIONS[; PENALTY].
 SECTION 2.  Section 51.204, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 51.204.  TRESPASS, DAMAGE, DEFACEMENT [ETC]. (a) In
 this section, "institution of higher education" and "private or
 independent institution of higher education" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  It is unlawful for any person to:
 (1)  trespass on the grounds of an [any state]
 institution of higher education or of a private or independent
 institution of higher education; [of this state] or
 (2)  damage or deface [to damage or deface] any of the
 buildings, statues, monuments, memorials, trees, shrubs, grasses,
 or flowers on the grounds of an institution [any state
 institutions] of higher education or of a private or independent
 institution of higher education.
 SECTION 3.  Section 51.208, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 51.208.  PENALTY; COURTS HAVING JURISDICTION. (a) In
 this section, "institution of higher education" and "private or
 independent institution of higher education" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  A person who violates any provision of this subchapter
 or any rule or regulation promulgated under this subchapter commits
 an offense. An offense under this subsection is a misdemeanor
 punishable by a fine of not more than $200.
 (c)  The judge of a municipal court or any justice of the
 peace of any city or county where property under the control and
 jurisdiction of an [a state] institution of higher education or of a
 private or independent institution of higher education is located
 is each separately vested with all jurisdiction necessary to hear
 and determine criminal cases involving violations of this
 subchapter or rules or regulations promulgated under this
 subchapter for which the punishment does not exceed a fine of $200.
 SECTION 4.  Section 51.209, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 51.209.  UNAUTHORIZED PERSONS; REFUSAL OF ENTRY,
 EJECTION, IDENTIFICATION. (a) In this section, "institution of
 higher education" and "private or independent institution of higher
 education" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  The governing board of an [a state] institution of
 higher education or a private or independent institution of higher
 education or the governing board's [its] authorized
 representatives may refuse to allow persons having no legitimate
 business to enter on property under the board's control, and may
 eject any undesirable person from the property on the person's
 [his] refusal to leave peaceably on request. Identification may be
 required of any person on the property, and the person must provide
 that identification on request.
 SECTION 5.  Section 51.202(b), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *