Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2667 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 2667
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 13, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 13, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 FraserX
 EstesX
 BirdwellX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HinojosaX
 LucioX
 NicholsX
 SeligerX
 UrestiX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the abolishment of certain programs administered by the
 Texas Economic Development Bank.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The following laws are repealed:
 (1)  Subchapter N, Chapter 481, Government Code; and
 (2)  Chapter 503, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 447.013(i), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (i)  A recipient of a grant or loan under this section is
 encouraged to purchase goods and services from small businesses and
 historically underutilized businesses, as those terms are defined
 by former Section 481.191, as that section existed on January 1,
 2015 [Government Code].
 SECTION 3.  Section 489.108, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 489.108.  PROGRAMS, SERVICES, AND FUNDS UNDER BANK'S
 DIRECTION. Notwithstanding any other law, the bank shall perform
 the duties and functions of the office with respect to the following
 programs, services, and funds:
 (1)  [the Texas Small Business Industrial Development
 Corporation established under Chapter 503, Local Government Code;
 [(2)]  the capital access program established under
 Section 481.405;
 (2) [(3)]  the Texas leverage fund;
 (3) [(4)     the linked deposit program established under
 Section 481.193;
 [(5)]  the enterprise zone program established under
 Chapter 2303;
 (4) [(6)]  the industrial revenue bond program;
 (5) [(7)]  the defense economic readjustment zone
 program established under Chapter 2310;
 (6) [(8)]  the Empowerment Zone and Enterprise
 Community grant program established under Section 481.025; and
 (7) [(9)]  the renewal community program.
 SECTION 4.  Section 39.909(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "small business" and "historically
 underutilized business" have the meanings assigned by former
 Section 481.191, Government Code, as that section existed on
 January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 5.  Section 52.256(a), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "small business" and "historically
 underutilized business" have the meanings assigned by former
 Section 481.191, Government Code, as that section existed on
 January 1, 2015.
 SECTION 6.  (a) The Texas Economic Development Bank shall
 reject any application for a linked deposit loan submitted to the
 bank before the effective date of this Act for which a linked
 deposit has not been made in accordance with Subchapter N, Chapter
 481, Government Code, as that subchapter existed immediately before
 being repealed by this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding the repeal by this Act of Subchapter N,
 Chapter 481, Government Code, Subchapter N is continued in effect
 for the limited purpose of allowing the Texas Economic Development
 Bank to administer linked deposits made before the effective date
 of this Act and to pursue the bank's remedies under that subchapter
 if:
 (1)  a recipient of a loan to which a deposit is linked
 defaults on the loan; or
 (2)  a lending institution that makes a loan for which a
 linked deposit is made fails to comply with that subchapter.
 SECTION 7.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Economic Development Bank shall send to the
 comptroller for deposit in the general revenue fund any revenue or
 other money of the Texas Small Business Industrial Development
 Corporation held in financial institutions as provided by Section
 503.055, Local Government Code, as that section existed immediately
 before that section's repeal by this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *