House | 05/14/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3465 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 837 | Journal Page: 3465 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3464 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Postponed | 5/15/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3420 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3420 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/14/15 9:54 AM | Journal Page: 3191 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2961 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2961 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 738 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 738 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Filed |