Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1673
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1119
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3581
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|