Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2747 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Landgraf, Faircloth H.B. No. 2747
 (Senate Sponsor - Creighton)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HuffmanX
 EllisX
 BirdwellX
 CreightonX
 EstesX
 FraserX
 NelsonX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to qualifications to serve as a petit juror.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 62.102, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 62.102.  GENERAL QUALIFICATIONS FOR JURY SERVICE. A
 person is disqualified to serve as a petit juror unless the person:
 (1)  is at least 18 years of age;
 (2)  is a citizen of the United States;
 (3)  is a resident [citizen] of this state and of the
 county in which the person is to serve as a juror;
 (4) [(3)]  is qualified under the constitution and laws
 to vote in the county in which the person is to serve as a juror;
 (5) [(4)]  is of sound mind and good moral character;
 (6) [(5)]  is able to read and write;
 (7) [(6)]  has not served as a petit juror for six days
 during the preceding three months in the county court or during the
 preceding six months in the district court;
 (8) [(7)]  has not been convicted of misdemeanor theft
 or a felony; and
 (9) [(8)]  is not under indictment or other legal
 accusation for misdemeanor theft or a felony.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *