Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2763 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Thompson of Brazoria H.B. No. 2763
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 13, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 22, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 22, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the current and potential economic impacts of
 recycling.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (2)  "Recycling" has the meaning assigned by Section
 361.421, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY OF ECONOMIC IMPACTS OF RECYCLING. (a) The
 commission shall conduct a study on the current and potential
 economic impacts of recycling, including state and local revenue
 that may be considered lost because recyclable materials are not
 recycled. The study must:
 (1)  assess current recycling efforts, including by:
 (A)  quantifying the amount of materials
 currently being recycled;
 (B)  assessing the cost, value, and quality of
 materials currently being recycled; and
 (C)  estimating the amount of materials that could
 be recycled but are not currently being recycled;
 (2)  identify methods that may be used, by the public
 sector, the private sector, or both, to increase recycling,
 including through the development of:
 (A)  new markets for recycled materials; and
 (B)  new businesses that may result from
 recycling;
 (3)  investigate the current and potential
 availability of funding for the methods identified under
 Subdivision (2);
 (4)  assess the current types and number of jobs
 associated with recycling and potential additional opportunities
 for job creation that may result from increased recycling; and
 (5)  assess infrastructure needs and development
 opportunities associated with recycling in rural areas.
 (b)  To the extent practicable, the commission shall use
 methodologies developed for other recycling studies performed in
 this state in performing the study under this section.
 (c)  The commission shall prepare a written report on the
 results of the study and include the report in the 2016 summary
 report titled "Municipal Solid Waste in Texas: A Year in Review."
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires August 31, 2017.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *