Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2788 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer, Frank (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2788
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a retail public water utility to
 require an operator of a correctional facility to comply with water
 conservation measures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.1461 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.1461.  CORRECTIONAL FACILITY COMPLIANCE WITH
 CONSERVATION MEASURES. A retail public utility may require the
 operator of a correctional facility, as defined by Section
 1.07(14), Penal Code, that receives retail water or sewer utility
 service from the retail public utility to comply with water
 conservation measures adopted or implemented by the retail public
 utility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *