House | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | 1/1/16 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3071 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3071 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#899 | Journal Page: 3070 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Motion to table fails | 3-E. Thompson | Journal Page: 3070 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment amended | 5-S. Turner | Journal Page: 3070 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption | 4-Nevrez | Journal Page: 3069 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Journal Page: 3068 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3068 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 3-E. Thompson | Journal Page: 3050 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3050 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amended | 2-Alvarado | Journal Page: 3049 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3047 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/11/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 278 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 278 | |
House | 11/13/2014 | Filed |