Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2827 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 2827
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
3- May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border
4- Security; May 18, 2015, reported favorably to Committee on Veteran
5- Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
6- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015,
7- sent to printer.)
8-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 2827
92
103
11- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
124 AN ACT
135 relating to the definition of homeland security activity.
146 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
157 SECTION 1. Section 421.001(3), Government Code, is amended
168 to read as follows:
179 (3) "Homeland security activity" means any activity
1810 related to the prevention or discovery of, response to, or recovery
1911 from:
2012 (A) a terrorist attack; [,]
2113 (B) a natural or man-made disaster; [,]
2214 (C) a hostile military or paramilitary action; [,
2315 or]
2416 (D) an extraordinary law enforcement emergency;
2517 or
2618 (E) a fire or medical emergency requiring
2719 resources beyond the capabilities of a local jurisdiction.
2820 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
2921 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
3022 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
3123 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3224 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
33- * * * * *
25+ ______________________________ ______________________________
26+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
27+ I certify that H.B. No. 2827 was passed by the House on April
28+ 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 3, 2 present, not
29+ voting.
30+ ______________________________
31+ Chief Clerk of the House
32+ I certify that H.B. No. 2827 was passed by the Senate on May
33+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
34+ ______________________________
35+ Secretary of the Senate
36+ APPROVED: _____________________
37+ Date
38+ _____________________
39+ Governor