Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2827 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Garcia) H.B. No. 2827
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border
 Security; May 18, 2015, reported favorably to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 21, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of homeland security activity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 421.001(3), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (3)  "Homeland security activity" means any activity
 related to the prevention or discovery of, response to, or recovery
 from:
 (A)  a terrorist attack; [,]
 (B)  a natural or man-made disaster; [,]
 (C)  a hostile military or paramilitary action; [,
 or]
 (D)  an extraordinary law enforcement emergency;
 or
 (E)  a fire or medical emergency requiring
 resources beyond the capabilities of a local jurisdiction.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *