E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4759
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1465
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2840
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2821
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 748
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|