Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2830 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Martinez, Springer (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 2830
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 11, 2015;
 May 15, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 22, 2015, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the duty of a county to refund an amount of $2 or less
 paid to the county clerk or district clerk.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 130, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 130.911 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.911.  COUNTY REFUND OF SMALL AMOUNT. A county is not
 required to refund an amount overpaid or otherwise paid in error to
 the county clerk or district clerk by a person if that amount is $2
 or less unless the person requests the refund in writing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *