Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2849 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Sheffield (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 2849
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications for a coronal polishing certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 265.006(b), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  To qualify for a coronal polishing certificate, an
 applicant must have at least two years' experience as a dental
 assistant and:
 (1)  have successfully completed at least eight hours
 of clinical and didactic education in coronal polishing taken
 through a dental school, dental hygiene school, or dental assisting
 program accredited by the Commission on Dental Accreditation of the
 American Dental Association and approved by the board. The
 education must include [that includes] courses on:
 (A)  oral anatomy and tooth morphology relating to
 retention of plaque and stain;
 (B)  indications, contraindications, and
 complications of coronal polishing;
 (C)  principles of coronal polishing, including
 armamentarium, operator and patient positioning, technique, and
 polishing agents;
 (D)  infection control procedures;
 (E)  polishing coronal surfaces of teeth; and
 (F)  jurisprudence relating to coronal polishing;
 or
 (2)  present proof to the board that the assistant has:
 (A)  graduated from a dental assisting program
 accredited by the Commission on Dental Accreditation of the
 American Dental Association and approved by the board that includes
 specific didactic course work and clinical training in coronal
 polishing; or
 (B)  received certification of completion of
 requirements specified by the Dental Assisting National Board and
 approved by the board.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the State Board of Dental Examiners shall adopt rules
 necessary to implement Section 265.006(b), Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *