E | 05/29/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/29/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5697 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4088 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1715 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3573 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1621 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1621 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1621 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1621 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1621 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1621 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1621 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1612 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1582 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1554 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#958 | Journal Page: 3173 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3173 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3173 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3104 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amended | 1-Canales | Journal Page: 3103 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | 5/11/15 5:30 PM | Journal Page: 3061 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3061 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1944 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 752 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |