Senate | 05/05/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1337 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1259 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2344 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2147 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | RV#448 | Journal Page: 2150 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2150 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2129 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2129 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1784 | |
House | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 753 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 753 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |