5 | 3 | | |
---|
6 | 4 | | |
---|
7 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 7 | | relating to the authority of certain municipalities to impose term |
---|
10 | 8 | | limits on certain elected officials. |
---|
11 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 26, Local Government |
---|
13 | 11 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 26.048 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 12 | | Sec. 26.048. TERM LIMITS IN POPULOUS MUNICIPALITIES. (a) |
---|
15 | 13 | | This section applies only to a municipality with a population of 1.8 |
---|
16 | 14 | | million or more. |
---|
17 | 15 | | (b) In this section: |
---|
18 | 16 | | (1) "Governing body of a municipality" means the mayor |
---|
19 | 17 | | and the council members of the municipality. |
---|
20 | 18 | | (2) "Municipal term limit" means a provision in a |
---|
21 | 19 | | municipal charter or ordinance that imposes a limit on the number of |
---|
22 | 20 | | terms or otherwise restricts the length of service a member of the |
---|
23 | 21 | | governing body of a municipality may serve on the governing body or |
---|
24 | 22 | | an elected controller of the municipality may serve as a |
---|
25 | 23 | | controller. |
---|
26 | 24 | | (c) The governing body of a municipality shall order an |
---|
27 | 25 | | election in the municipality on the question of imposing term |
---|
28 | 26 | | limits of a maximum of two four-year terms on the members of the |
---|
29 | 27 | | governing body of the municipality and the controller of the |
---|
30 | 28 | | municipality. |
---|
31 | 29 | | (d) The ballot at the election must be printed to permit |
---|
32 | 30 | | voting for or against the proposition: "Authorizing term limits |
---|
33 | 31 | | consisting of not more than two four-year terms on a person's |
---|
34 | 32 | | service as the mayor, a council member, or the controller of the |
---|
35 | 33 | | City of (insert name of municipality)." |
---|
36 | 34 | | (e) If a majority of the votes received at the election |
---|
37 | 35 | | favor the proposition, the number and length of terms a person may |
---|
38 | 36 | | serve on the governing body or as the controller is limited to a |
---|
39 | 37 | | maximum of two four-year terms. The municipality shall amend the |
---|
40 | 38 | | municipality's charter or ordinance to adjust the number and length |
---|
41 | 39 | | of the terms of the members of the governing body and the controller |
---|
42 | 40 | | as necessary to comply with the proposition. |
---|
43 | 41 | | (f) If less than a majority of the votes received at the |
---|
44 | 42 | | election favor the proposition, municipal term limits and the |
---|
45 | 43 | | length of the terms of the members of the governing body and the |
---|
46 | 44 | | controller that existed before the election are not affected. |
---|
47 | 45 | | (g) A term limit authorized by this section applies only to |
---|
48 | 46 | | members of the governing body of a municipality or a controller of a |
---|
49 | 47 | | municipality elected at a general election held on or after |
---|
50 | 48 | | November 5, 2019. |
---|
51 | 49 | | (h) In applying a term limit authorized by this section: |
---|
52 | 50 | | (1) a member of the governing body of a municipality or |
---|
53 | 51 | | a controller of a municipality is eligible for election to another |
---|
54 | 52 | | municipal office that the member of the governing body or |
---|
55 | 53 | | controller has not previously held; |
---|
56 | 54 | | (2) the office of council member of the municipality, |
---|
57 | 55 | | whether elected by district or at-large, is considered to be the |
---|
58 | 56 | | same office; |
---|
59 | 57 | | (3) a person who was barred from election to a certain |
---|
60 | 58 | | office by the municipality's charter or ordinance before November |
---|
61 | 59 | | 5, 2019, continues to be barred from election to the same office; |
---|
62 | 60 | | (4) a member of the governing body or a controller who |
---|
63 | 61 | | is serving a first or second term as a member of the governing body |
---|
64 | 62 | | or as the controller is eligible for election to serve one |
---|
65 | 63 | | additional four-year term in the same office; |
---|
66 | 64 | | (5) a member of the governing body or a controller who |
---|
67 | 65 | | is serving a third term as a member of the governing body or as the |
---|
68 | 66 | | controller is not eligible for election to the same office; |
---|
69 | 67 | | (6) a term to which a member of the governing body or a |
---|
70 | 68 | | controller was elected or appointed before the election held under |
---|
71 | 69 | | Subsection (c) is counted only if the member or controller served |
---|
72 | 70 | | one-half or more of the term; and |
---|
73 | 71 | | (7) a partial term to which a member of the governing |
---|
74 | 72 | | body or a controller is elected or appointed on or after the date of |
---|
75 | 73 | | the election held under Subsection (c) is counted only if the member |
---|
76 | 74 | | or controller serves one-half or more of the term. |
---|
77 | 75 | | (i) This section expires January 1, 2020. |
---|
78 | 76 | | SECTION 2. If this Act takes effect immediately, the |
---|
79 | 77 | | governing body of a municipality shall order an election as |
---|
80 | 78 | | provided by Section 26.048, Local Government Code, as added by this |
---|
81 | 79 | | Act, to be held on November 3, 2015. If this Act takes effect |
---|
82 | 80 | | September 1, 2015, the governing body shall order an election as |
---|
83 | 81 | | provided by that section to be held on November 7, 2017. |
---|
84 | 82 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
85 | 83 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
86 | 84 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
87 | 85 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
88 | 86 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|