Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3283
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#996
|
Journal Page: 3282
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3282
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3282
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3130
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#915
|
Journal Page: 3129
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3129
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3127
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3127
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
|
|
Journal Page: 3066
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 7, Section 37
|
Journal Page: 3024
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3023
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#883
|
Journal Page: 3023
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Motion to table fails
|
|
Journal Page: 3023
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Motion to reconsider
|
|
Journal Page: 3022
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 2961
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2957
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#834
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Failed to pass to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Raney
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|