E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4841
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1572
|
Journal Page: 4841
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4841
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4574
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1993
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1348
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2485
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|