LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2926
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2926
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2926
Compare Versions
HB2926 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2926 Engrossed February 2, 2025
HB2926 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2926 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB2926 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB2926 Comm Sub April 17, 2015
HB2926 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2926 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2926 Engrossed February 2, 2025
HB2926 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2926 Enrolled May 28, 2015
HB2926 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB2926 Comm Sub April 17, 2015
HB2926 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare