Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2945 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Alonzo (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2945
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of the juvenile case manager fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 102.0174(g), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (g)  A fund created under this section may be used [only] to
 finance the salary, benefits, training, travel expenses, office
 supplies, and other necessary expenses relating to the position of
 a juvenile case manager employed under Article 45.056. If there is
 money in the fund after those costs are paid, on approval by the
 employing court, a juvenile case manager may direct the remaining
 money to be used to implement programs directly related to the
 duties of the juvenile case manager, including juvenile alcohol and
 substance abuse programs, educational and leadership programs, and
 any other projects designed to prevent or reduce the number of
 juvenile referrals to the court. The fund may not be used to
 supplement the income of an employee whose primary role is not that
 of a juvenile case manager.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *