House | 05/11/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 756 | |
House | 03/16/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 756 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |