E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3626
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3616
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5751
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1773
|
Journal Page: 5750
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5748
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3439
|
Journal Page: 5747
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6021
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1056
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3523
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2865
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2853
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4995
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4759
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2146
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1390
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1348
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2483
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|