LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB2968
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB2968
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2968
Compare Versions
HB2968 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2968 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2968 Enrolled May 31, 2015
HB2968 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB2968 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB2968 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB2968 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB2968 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2968 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB2968 Enrolled May 31, 2015
HB2968 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB2968 Engrossed May 5, 2015
HB2968 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB2968 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare