House | 05/04/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2410 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1703 | Journal Page: 2409 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Postponed | 5/4/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2312 |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2312 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2063 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 900 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |