E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/25/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4774
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2028
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4467
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4110
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1591
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1012
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3297
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Frullo and Bohac
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2451
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|