Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3035 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R10003 EES-D
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 3035


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the savings to the state achieved by the
 expansion of Medicaid managed care in regards to the provision of
 prescription drugs and other pharmacy benefits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
 shall conduct a study on the accuracy of the Legislative Budget
 Board's estimate that the changes in law made by Chapter 7 (S.B. 7),
 Acts of the 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, would
 produce a savings of $467,628,328 for the state during the fiscal
 biennium ending August 31, 2013. In conducting the study, the
 Health and Human Services Commission shall focus on the savings
 achieved by the changes in law relating to the expansion of Medicaid
 managed care, particularly with regard to the increase in the
 provision of prescription drugs and other pharmacy benefits
 provided through Medicaid managed care organizations.
 (b)  Not later than December 31, 2016, the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall submit a report containing the results of
 the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires December 31, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.