Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3062 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3062
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Jobs and Education for Texans Grant Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 134.001, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (1) to read as follows:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Workforce
 Commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 134.002(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission [comptroller] shall establish and
 administer the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) fund as a
 dedicated account in the general revenue fund.
 SECTION 3.  Section 134.003, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.003.  ADVISORY BOARD. (a) An advisory board of
 education and workforce stakeholders is created to assist the
 commission [comptroller] in administering this chapter.
 (b)  The advisory board is composed of six [seven] members
 who serve two-year terms and are appointed as follows:
 (1)  one member appointed by the governor;
 (2)  one member appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  one member appointed by the speaker of the house of
 representatives;
 (4)  one member appointed by the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board;
 (5)  one member appointed by the commission [Texas
 Workforce Commission]; and
 (6)  the chair of the commission [one member of the
 public appointed by the comptroller; and
 [(7)  the comptroller], who serves as the presiding
 officer.
 (c)  The advisory board shall meet at least once each
 quarter, or as needed, to review received applications and
 recommend awarding grants under this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  Section 134.004, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.004.  JOBS AND EDUCATION FOR TEXANS (JET) GRANT
 PROGRAM. (a) The commission [comptroller] shall establish and
 administer the Jobs and Education for Texans (JET) Grant Program to
 provide grants to public junior colleges, [and] public technical
 institutes, and independent school districts described under
 Section 134.007 that apply to the advisory board in the manner
 prescribed by the advisory board. The commission [comptroller]
 shall award the grants on the advice and recommendations of the
 advisory board.
 (b)  Grants may be awarded under this chapter from the Jobs
 and Education for Texans (JET) fund  to defray the start-up costs
 associated with the development of new career and technical
 education programs at public junior colleges, [and] public
 technical institutes, and independent school districts described
 under Section 134.007 that meet the requirements of Section
 134.006.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 134.006(a), (c), and (d), Education
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission [comptroller] may award a grant for the
 development of new career and technical education courses or
 programs at public junior colleges, [and] public technical
 institutes, and independent school districts.
 (c)  In awarding a grant under this section, the commission
 [comptroller] shall primarily consider the potential economic
 returns to the state from the development of the career and
 technical education course or program.  The commission
 [comptroller] may also consider whether the course or program:
 (1)  is part of a new, emerging industry or high-demand
 occupation;
 (2)  offers new or expanded dual credit career and
 technical educational opportunities in public high schools; or
 (3)  is provided in cooperation with other public
 junior colleges or public technical institutes across existing
 service areas.
 (d)  To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a
 public junior college, [or] public technical institute, or
 independent school district described under Section 134.007 must
 provide matching funds in accordance with rules adopted under
 Section 134.008. The matching funds may be obtained from any source
 available to the public junior college, public [or] technical
 institute, or independent school district, including [in-kind
 contributions,] industry consortia, community or foundation
 grants, individual contributions, and local governmental agency
 operating funds.
 SECTION 6.  Chapter 134, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Section 134.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 134.007.  GRANTS AWARDED TO INDEPENDENT SCHOOL
 DISTRICT. The commission may award a grant to an independent school
 district under this chapter if the district has entered into a
 partnership with a public junior college or public technical
 institute for the purpose of:
 (1)  promoting career and technical education to the
 district's students; or
 (2)  offering dual credit courses to the district's
 students.
 SECTION 7.  Section 134.008, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 134.008.  RULES. The commission [comptroller] shall
 adopt rules as necessary for the administration of this chapter.
 SECTION 8.  (a)  Not later than September 1, 2015:
 (1)  the administration of the Jobs and Education for
 Texans Grant Program shall be transferred from the comptroller to
 the Texas Workforce Commission;
 (2)  all rules, forms, policies, procedures, or
 decisions of the comptroller that are related to the Jobs and
 Education for Texans Grant Program are continued in effect as
 rules, forms, policies, procedures, or decisions of the Texas
 Workforce Commission until superseded by a rule or other
 appropriate act of the Texas Workforce Commission;
 (3)  all money, obligations, memoranda of
 understanding, leases, rights, and contracts, including grant
 agreements, of the comptroller related to the Jobs and Education
 for Texans Grant Program are transferred to the Texas Workforce
 Commission, and the Texas Workforce Commission assumes, without a
 change in status, the position of the comptroller in all
 transferred contracts, including grant agreements, related to the
 Jobs and Education for Texans Grant Program;
 (4)  records in the custody of the comptroller related
 to the Jobs and Education for Texans Grant Program are transferred
 to and become the property of the Texas Workforce Commission; and
 (5)  a reference in law or administrative rule to the
 comptroller relating to the administration of the Jobs and
 Education for Texans Grant Program means the Texas Workforce
 Commission.
 (b)  Before the transfer of the administration of the Jobs
 and Education for Texans Grant Program, the comptroller and the
 Texas Workforce Commission shall coordinate the transfer of powers
 and duties, including records, appropriations, disbursements,
 compliance audits, monitoring and enforcement, and other items, to
 ensure a smooth transition.
 SECTION 9.  An independent school district may be awarded a
 grant in accordance with Section 134.007, Education Code, as added
 by this Act, beginning with the 2016-2017 academic year.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *