Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB307 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: White of Tyler (Senate Sponsor - Burton) H.B. No. 307
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
3- May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
4- Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
5- Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 307
72
83
9- COMMITTEE VOTE
10- YeaNayAbsentPNV
11- WhitmireX
12- HuffmanX
13- BurtonX
14- CreightonX
15- HinojosaX
16- MenéndezX
17- PerryX
18- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
194 AN ACT
205 relating to a study on the feasibility and potential costs and
216 benefits of implementing a pay-for-performance contract program
227 for certain criminal justice programs and services.
238 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
249 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "department" means the
2510 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
2611 (b) The department shall conduct a study to determine the
2712 feasibility and potential costs and benefits to this state of
2813 implementing a pay-for-performance contract program under which
2914 the department would:
3015 (1) contract with an administrator for the operation
3116 of criminal justice programs or the provision of criminal justice
3217 services, the operation or provision of which would be funded using
3318 investor-provided financial capital; and
3419 (2) make contract payments to the administrator using
3520 general obligation bond proceeds or other available money only if
3621 specified performance requirements for and outcomes from the
3722 programs and services are achieved and the return on investment to
3823 this state is positive, thereby rewarding successful results and
3924 shifting the financial risk from this state.
4025 (c) The department may request assistance and information
4126 from the comptroller of public accounts, the Texas Public Finance
4227 Authority, or any other state agency as necessary to conduct the
4328 study required by this section.
4429 (d) Not later than November 1, 2016, the department shall
4530 submit a report on the results of the study to the governor, the
4631 lieutenant governor, and the presiding officers of the standing
4732 committees of the senate and house of representatives having
4833 jurisdiction over criminal justice programs and services. The
4934 report must indicate whether and to what degree implementing a
5035 pay-for-performance program described by Subsection (b) of this
5136 section would be cost-effective and feasible, as determined by the
5237 department. If the department determines a pay-for-performance
5338 program would be cost-effective and feasible, the report must:
5439 (1) make recommendations regarding the manner in which
5540 the department could effectively operate the program and the types
5641 of criminal justice programs and services that would be selected
5742 for the program; and
5843 (2) identify any changes in law necessary for
5944 implementation of the program.
6045 (e) This section expires January 1, 2017.
6146 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6247 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6348 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6449 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6550 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
66- * * * * *
51+ ______________________________ ______________________________
52+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
53+ I certify that H.B. No. 307 was passed by the House on May 6,
54+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 5, 2 present, not
55+ voting.
56+ ______________________________
57+ Chief Clerk of the House
58+ I certify that H.B. No. 307 was passed by the Senate on May
59+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
60+ ______________________________
61+ Secretary of the Senate
62+ APPROVED: _____________________
63+ Date
64+ _____________________
65+ Governor