Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB307 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: White of Tyler (Senate Sponsor - Burton) H.B. No. 307
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 HuffmanX
 BurtonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MenéndezX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study on the feasibility and potential costs and
 benefits of implementing a pay-for-performance contract program
 for certain criminal justice programs and services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) In this section, "department" means the
 Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
 (b)  The department shall conduct a study to determine the
 feasibility and potential costs and benefits to this state of
 implementing a pay-for-performance contract program under which
 the department would:
 (1)  contract with an administrator for the operation
 of criminal justice programs or the provision of criminal justice
 services, the operation or provision of which would be funded using
 investor-provided financial capital; and
 (2)  make contract payments to the administrator using
 general obligation bond proceeds or other available money only if
 specified performance requirements for and outcomes from the
 programs and services are achieved and the return on investment to
 this state is positive, thereby rewarding successful results and
 shifting the financial risk from this state.
 (c)  The department may request assistance and information
 from the comptroller of public accounts, the Texas Public Finance
 Authority, or any other state agency as necessary to conduct the
 study required by this section.
 (d)  Not later than November 1, 2016, the department shall
 submit a report on the results of the study to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the presiding officers of the standing
 committees of the senate and house of representatives having
 jurisdiction over criminal justice programs and services. The
 report must indicate whether and to what degree implementing a
 pay-for-performance program described by Subsection (b) of this
 section would be cost-effective and feasible, as determined by the
 department.  If the department determines a pay-for-performance
 program would be cost-effective and feasible, the report must:
 (1)  make recommendations regarding the manner in which
 the department could effectively operate the program and the types
 of criminal justice programs and services that would be selected
 for the program; and
 (2)  identify any changes in law necessary for
 implementation of the program.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *