Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1554 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3161 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#942 | Journal Page: 3160 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3160 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3160 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3059 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#892 | Journal Page: 3059 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3059 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amended | 1-S. Turner | Journal Page: 3058 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3057 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 972 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 972 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |