House | 05/14/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3511 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 653 | Journal Page: 3511 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 905 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 905 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |