House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3330 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#1043 | Journal Page: 3330 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3330 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amended | 20-Faircloth | Journal Page: 3330 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 3327 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | 11-Sheffield | Journal Page: 3326 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment fails of adoption | 10-Springer | Journal Page: 3326 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Motion to table fails | 10-Springer | Journal Page: 3326 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 9-Springer | Journal Page: 3326 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3325 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 8:00 PM | Journal Page: 3247 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3247 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Amended | 2-Schaefer | Journal Page: 3187 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 5:00 AM | Journal Page: 3052 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3052 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 972 | |
House | 03/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 972 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |