Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1554
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3120
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3120
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 973
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 973
|
House
|
03/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|