E | 06/16/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/16/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4984 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2290 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4338 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1917 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1917 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1917 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1917 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1916 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1916 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1916 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1849 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1398 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2576 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#641 | Journal Page: 2575 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2575 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2575 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2519 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 914 | |
House | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 914 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Filed |