Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3244 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Burkett (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 3244
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing broker agreements for the sale of real
 property held in trust by home-rule municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 253.014(b), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The governing body of a home-rule municipality may
 contract with a broker to sell a tract of real property that [is
 owned by] the municipality:
 (1)  owns; or
 (2)  holds in trust and has the authority to sell.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *