Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB326 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wu, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 326
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information provided by electronic means in support of
 the issuance of a search warrant.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 18.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)(1) For purposes of this article, a magistrate may
 consider information communicated by telephone or other reliable
 electronic means in determining whether to issue a search warrant.
 The magistrate may examine an applicant for a search warrant and any
 person on whose testimony the application is based.  The applicant
 or other person must be placed under oath before the examination.
 (2)  If an applicant for a search warrant attests to the
 contents of an affidavit submitted by reliable electronic means,
 the magistrate must acknowledge the attestation in writing on the
 affidavit. If the magistrate considers additional testimony or
 exhibits, the magistrate must:
 (A)  ensure that the testimony is recorded
 verbatim by an electronic recording device, by a court reporter, or
 in writing;
 (B)  ensure that any recording or reporter's notes
 are transcribed and that the transcription is certified as accurate
 and is preserved;
 (C)  sign, certify the accuracy of, and preserve
 any other written record; and
 (D)  ensure that the exhibits are preserved.
 (3)  An applicant for a search warrant who submits
 information as authorized by this subsection must prepare a
 proposed duplicate original of the warrant and must read or
 otherwise transmit its contents verbatim to the magistrate. A
 magistrate must enter into an original search warrant the contents
 of a proposed duplicate original that are read to the magistrate. If
 the applicant transmits the contents by reliable electronic means,
 the transmission received by the magistrate may serve as the
 original search warrant.
 (4)  The magistrate may modify a search warrant that is
 submitted as described by Subdivision (3). If the magistrate
 modifies the warrant, the magistrate must:
 (A)  transmit the modified version to the
 applicant by reliable electronic means; or
 (B)  file the modified original and direct the
 applicant to modify the proposed duplicate original accordingly.
 (5)  A magistrate who issues a search warrant for which
 information is provided by telephone or reliable electronic means
 must:
 (A)  sign the original documents;
 (B)  enter the date and time of issuance on the
 warrant; and
 (C)  transmit the warrant by reliable electronic
 means to the applicant or direct the applicant to sign the judge's
 name and enter the date and time on the duplicate original.
 (6)  Evidence obtained pursuant to a search warrant for
 which information was provided in accordance with this subsection
 is not subject to suppression on the ground that issuing the warrant
 in compliance with this subsection was unreasonable under the
 circumstances, absent a finding of bad faith.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a search warrant that is issued on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A search warrant that was issued before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 warrant was issued, and the former law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *