E
|
06/18/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4317
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1372
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4111
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1247
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#389
|
Journal Page: 1978
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1978
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Wu
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1977
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Postponed
|
4/27/15 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 1963
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1961
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Wu
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1912
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1706
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 781
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|