LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB3291
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB3291
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB3291
Compare Versions
HB3291 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3291 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3291 Enrolled May 24, 2015
HB3291 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB3291 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB3291 Comm Sub April 16, 2015
HB3291 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB3291 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3291 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB3291 Enrolled May 24, 2015
HB3291 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
HB3291 Engrossed April 28, 2015
HB3291 Comm Sub April 16, 2015
HB3291 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare