Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3291 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2015

                    By: Raymond (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3291
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources and Economic Development; May 18, 2015, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3291 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to transactions involving oil, gas, or condensate;
 creating a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter K, Chapter 85, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 85.390 to read as follows:
 Sec. 85.390.  TRANSACTION WITHOUT APPROVAL, AUTHORIZATION,
 OR PERMIT. (a) A person who is not a pipeline operator or gatherer
 authorized to operate by the commission commits an offense if the
 person recklessly possesses, transports, removes, delivers,
 accepts, purchases, sells, or physically moves oil, gas, or
 condensate as part of a transaction for which the commission
 requires a permit or commission approval or authorization unless
 the commission has:
 (1)  issued a permit, approval, or authorization for
 the transaction; or
 (2)  received a request for a permit, approval, or
 authorization for the transaction and the request is pending before
 the commission.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a felony of the second
 degree.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *