Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3315 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gutierrez (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 3315
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 30, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 15, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to changing the name of the Medical Advisory Committee
 appointed by the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation to
 the Combative Sports Advisory Board and allowing the board to
 address a broader range of issues.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2052.055, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2052.055.  COMBATIVE SPORTS [MEDICAL] ADVISORY BOARD
 [COMMITTEE]. (a) The presiding officer of the commission, with the
 commission's approval, may appoint a combative sports [medical]
 advisory board [committee] to advise the department concerning
 [health] issues relating to [for] combative sports events and
 [event] contestants.
 (b)  If the commission elects to appoint an advisory board
 [committee], the commission by rule shall establish:
 (1)  the number of board [committee] members;
 (2)  qualifications for appointment to the board
 [committee]; and
 (3)  the purpose and duties of the board [committee].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *