House | 04/29/2015 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1960 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 783 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |