House | 05/04/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 784 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |