Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1466
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#762
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2729
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Kacal, Burns, Paddie, Ashby, Sheffield, K. King, Spitzer, and Springer
|
Journal Page: 2729
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2729
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 785
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|