E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4975
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1624
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1555
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#919
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3139
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3014
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1998
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1984
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 787
|
House
|
03/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|