House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3457 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1086 | Journal Page: 3456 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amendment withdrawn | 4-Minjarez | Journal Page: 3456 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 2-C. Turner | Journal Page: 3455 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3455 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 881 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 881 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |