Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3402 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 3402
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2015;
 May 14, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources and Economic Development; May 22, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; May 22, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a venue district to act as an endorsing
 municipality or endorsing county for purposes of games or event
 trust funds; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 335, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 335.078 to read as follows:
 Sec. 335.078.  VENUE DISTRICT AS ENDORSING MUNICIPALITY OR
 COUNTY. (a) A venue district located in a county with a population
 of 3.3 million or more may act as an endorsing municipality or
 endorsing county under Chapter 1507, Acts of the 76th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1999 (Article 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil
 Statutes).
 (b)  A venue district acting as an endorsing municipality or
 endorsing county under Chapter 1507, Acts of the 76th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1999 (Article 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil
 Statutes), shall remit for deposit into the trust fund established
 for the games or event the amounts determined by the comptroller
 under that chapter. The comptroller shall determine the
 incremental increase in receipts attributable to the games or event
 and related activities under that chapter based on the amount of
 applicable taxes imposed by each municipality or county that
 comprises the venue district and not on the amount of taxes imposed
 by the venue district.
 (c)  A venue district acting as an endorsing municipality or
 endorsing county under Chapter 1507, Acts of the 76th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1999 (Article 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil
 Statutes), may guarantee the district's obligations under a games
 or event support contract by pledging surcharges from user fees,
 including parking or ticket fees, charged in connection with the
 games or event and related activities.
 (d)  Subject to Subsection (b), a venue district acting as an
 endorsing municipality or endorsing county under Chapter 1507, Acts
 of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999 (Article 5190.14,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), as authorized by this section, has
 all the powers of an endorsing municipality or endorsing county
 under that chapter, and any action an endorsing municipality or
 endorsing county is required to take by ordinance or order under
 that chapter may be taken by order or resolution of the venue
 district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *